Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Lee

Deceased

Bishop of Clifton, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1875BornMitchelstown, County Cork
2 Mar 190125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Clifton, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 193156.2AppointedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
26 Jan 193256.3Ordained BishopBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 194872.9DiedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Lee
Bishop William Lee (born , died ) Bishop of Clifton

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 4
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 138
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 3 May 2016