Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Alberto Luna Tobar, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1923Born
23 Jun 194622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
17 Aug 197753.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
17 Aug 197753.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulli
18 Sep 197753.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulli
7 Mar 198157.2AppointedArchbishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
15 Feb 200076.1RetiredArchbishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
7 Feb 201793.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Luis Alberto Luna Tobar (VIAF: 21157927)
Archbishop Luis Alberto Luna Tobar O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Death PlaceValle de Los Chillos, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 70.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: CB, 7 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jul 2017