Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel de Jesús Serrano Abad

Deceased

Archbishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1898BornCuenca
22 Dec 192224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cuenca, Ecuador
18 Aug 195455.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
18 Aug 195455.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
13 Nov 195455.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
16 Nov 195657.9AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
9 Apr 195758.3AppointedArchbishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
21 Apr 197172.3DiedArchbishop of Cuenca, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Jesús Serrano Abad:
Archbishop Manuel de Jesús Serrano Abad (born , died ) Archbishop of Cuenca

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013