Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlos María Javier Cardinal de la Torre

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1873BornQuito
19 Dec 189623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
30 Dec 191138.1AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
26 May 191238.5Ordained BishopBishop of Loja, Ecuador
21 Aug 191945.8AppointedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
20 Dec 192653.1AppointedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
8 Sep 193359.8AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
12 Jan 195379.2Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195379.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Aquiro
23 Jun 196793.6RetiredArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
31 Jul 196894.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Carlos María Javier de la Torre:
Cardinal Carlos María Javier de la Torre (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

  • a priest for 71.6 years
  • a bishop for 56.2 years
  • a cardinal for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013