Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Angel Romero Gross, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Puyo, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Molicunza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1918Born
18 Jan 194223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Jul 197355.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Canelos, Ecuador
5 Jul 197355.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Molicunza
15 Aug 197355.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Molicunza
28 Feb 199071.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Puyo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Tomás Angel Romero Gross
Bishop Tomás Angel Romero Gross O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Puyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast