Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oscar Omar Aparicio Céspedes

Archbishop of Cochabamba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1959 BornLa Paz
29 Nov 198728.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Paz, Bolivia
29 May 200242.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
29 May 200242.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Citium
25 Jul 200242.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citium
4 Apr 201252.5AppointedBishop of Bolivia, Military
24 Sep 201455.0AppointedArchbishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Oscar Omar Aparicio Céspedes:
Archbishop Oscar Omar Aparicio Céspedes (born ) Archbishop of Cochabamba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cochabamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,232
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Sep 2014