Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Rajendram Antony

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trincomalee-Batticaloa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1927BornKaramban
7 Dec 195427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
3 Aug 196841.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
3 Aug 196841.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Fissiana
21 Nov 196841.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fissiana
18 Dec 197245.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
15 Feb 197446.8SucceededBishop of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
17 Mar 198355.9ResignedBishop of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
3 Dec 201285.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Leo Rajendram Antony:
Bishop Leo Rajendram Antony (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trincomalee-Batticaloa

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 3 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013