Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Gil Lechoza

Deceased

Bishop of Minas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1932BornGaldames, Spain
13 Aug 196634.2Ordained PriestPriest of Minas, Uruguay
9 Nov 198553.4AppointedBishop of Minas, Uruguay
14 Dec 198553.5Ordained BishopBishop of Minas, Uruguay
21 Jun 200169.0DiedBishop of Minas, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Victor Gil Lechoza:
Bishop Victor Gil Lechoza (born , died ) Bishop of Minas

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013