Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Giglioli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1924BornBuonconvento
29 Jun 194723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Siena, Italy
24 Apr 197046.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siena, Italy
24 Apr 197046.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bitylius
13 Jun 197046.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bitylius
7 Oct 197551.7AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
7 Oct 197551.7AppointedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
30 Sep 198662.7AppointedBishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza, Italy
25 Mar 200076.1RetiredBishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza, Italy
3 Jan 200580.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Giglioli:
Bishop Alberto Giglioli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013