Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Toccabelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1889BornVestone
6 Apr 191222.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 193041.2AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
26 Oct 193041.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
6 Jan 193141.5InstalledBishop of Alatri, Italy
1 Apr 193545.7AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
14 Apr 196171.8DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Toccabelli:
Archbishop Mario Toccabelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013