Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Gianuzzi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹Born
2 Dec 166973.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
18 May 167074.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
23 Aug 168084.6DiedTitular Bishop of Dioclea

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Gianuzzi:
Bishop Domenico Gianuzzi (born 1596, died ) Titular Bishop of Dioclea

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015