Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Lucidus Cataneo

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1613BornMantuan
10 Dec 167360.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 167460.4AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
8 Apr 167460.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
Feb 168571.3DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Joannes Lucidus Cataneo:
Bishop Joannes Lucidus Cataneo Bishop of Mantova

  • a priest for 11.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013