Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Molinari

Deceased

Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626¹Born
8 Apr 165125.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 167650.9AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
6 Dec 167650.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
11 Jul 169872.5DiedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Molinari
Bishop Antonio Molinari (born 1626, died ) Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast