Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Scannagatta

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹Born
6 Apr 165826.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 167947.4AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
18 Jun 167947.4Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
18 Mar 170068.2DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Scannagatta
Bishop Francesco Scannagatta (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDongo

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast