Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Valvassori, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1611BornTrezzo
11 Jan 167765.3AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
7 Feb 167765.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
15 Oct 168473.0DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Valvassori:
Bishop Girolamo Valvassori O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 315
  • bp/bd/c34/d: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015