Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Martini

Deceased

Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1625BornPomperiana
25 Jul 164924.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Jul 164924.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 167853.0AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
13 Mar 167853.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
Aug 168762.5DiedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Martini:
Bishop Antonio de Martini (born , died Aug 1687) Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 100, and Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015