Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Alphonse de Suarès

Deceased

Bishop of Vaison


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1642BornAvignon
18 Sep 166624.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 167128.9AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
17 May 167128.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vaison, France
7 Jul 167129.1InstalledBishop of Vaison, France
13 Mar 168542.8DiedBishop of Vaison, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Alphonse de Suarès:
Bishop Louis-Alphonse de Suarès (born , died ) Bishop of Vaison

  • a priest for 18.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013