Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Neri

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1628Born
31 Dec 165426.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 167244.2AppointedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
22 May 167244.2Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
10 Jan 167849.9AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
Dec 1684²56.8DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Neri
Bishop Francesco Maria Neri (born , died Dec 1684) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTivoli, Diocese of Tivoli

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 259, and Page 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast