Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vitus Piluzzi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Sep 1678AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
18 Sep 1678Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
6 Jan 1704DiedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis

MicroData Summary for Vitus Piluzzi:
Archbishop Vitus Piluzzi O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 111, and Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013