Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

Apostolicus Vicariatus Giennensis in Peruvia seu Sancti Francisci Xaverii



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 22 November 1980
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 32,572 (12,580 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.vicariatodejaen.org/
  • Mailing Address: Diego Palomino 1750, Apartado 6, Jaen, Cajamarca, Peru
  • Telephone: (76)43.12.45
  • Fax: 43.11.49

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of San Francisco Javier
11 January 1946ErectedDiocese of Cajamarca
Diocese of Chachapoyas
Vicariate Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón
Prefecture Apostolic of San Francisco Javier (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of San Francisco Javier
24 April 1971ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of San Francisco Javier Vicariate Apostolic of San Francisco Javier
Vicariate Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
22 November 1980Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of San Francisco Javier Vicariate Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of San Francisco Javier
194915,94825,00063.8%553,1898ap1951
196590,000100,00090.0%115165,62523337ap1967
196890,000105,00085.7%20204,50030547ap1971
Vicariate Apostolic of San Francisco Javier
1976182,000192,00094.8%225276,74034952ap1977
Vicariate Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
1980206,000217,00094.9%720277,6292792ap1981
1990443,000482,00091.9%11213213,843309324ap1991
1999351,000369,00095.1%15132812,53512210926ap2000
2000345,723363,02395.2%18133111,15212211726ap2001
2001345,723363,02395.2%19133210,80312112426ap2002
2002373,800415,30290.0%16132912,88912113226ap2003
2003380,250452,60384.0%15132813,58012112428ap2004
2004373,800480,25777.8%13142713,84412212829ap2005
2010403,900519,20177.8%18183611,21912611624ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011