Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Gabriels

Deceased

Bishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1838Born
21 Sep 186122.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 189253.2AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
5 May 189253.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
23 Apr 192182.5DiedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Gabriels (VIAF: 73242516)
Bishop Henry Gabriels (born , died ) Bishop of Ogdensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWannegem-Lede, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Albany, Diocese of Albany, New York

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 423
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017