Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Joseph Scollard

Deceased

Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1862Born
21 Dec 189028.1Ordained PriestPriest of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
20 Sep 190441.8AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
24 Feb 190542.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
7 Aug 193471.7DiedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for David Joseph Scollard
Bishop David Joseph Scollard (born , died ) Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnnismore

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast