Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Caesar Gatimu

Deceased

Bishop of Nyeri, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1921Born
17 Mar 194725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nyeri, Kenya
18 Apr 196139.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nyeri, Kenya
18 Apr 196139.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
21 May 196140.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
25 Nov 196443.5AppointedBishop of Nyeri, Kenya
20 Feb 198765.7DiedBishop of Nyeri, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Caesar Gatimu
Bishop Caesar Gatimu (born , died ) Bishop of Nyeri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTetu

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast