Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nyeri

Archidioecesis Nyeriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter J. Kairo, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 21 May 1990
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Kenya
  • Square Kilometers: 7,823 (3,021 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 288, Nyeri, Kenya
  • Telephone: (034)30.446/7
  • Fax: 30.435

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kenya
14 September 1905ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Kenya (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kenya
12 July 1909ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Kenya Vicariate Apostolic of Kenya
10 March 1926Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kenya Prefecture Apostolic of Meru (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nyeri
10 March 1926Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kenya Vicariate Apostolic of Nyeri
Diocese of Nyeri
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nyeri Diocese of Nyeri
25 November 1964Territory LostDiocese of Nyeri Diocese of Marsabit (erected)
17 March 1983Territory LostDiocese of Nyeri Diocese of Muranga (erected)
Archdiocese of Nyeri
21 May 1990ElevatedDiocese of Nyeri Archdiocese of Nyeri
5 December 2002Territory LostArchdiocese of Nyeri Diocese of Nyahururu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Nyeri
195040,180750,0005.4%844527726714219ap1951
Diocese of Nyeri
1969293,0001,497,00019.6%3158893,2929624233ap1971
1980620,0001,658,00037.4%3650867,2098220740ap1981
Archdiocese of Nyeri
1990514,4271,138,08545.2%5614707,3485214927ap1991
1999534,7861,179,78645.3%86141005,3475719548ap2000
2000556,4491,180,96447.1%91141055,2995917154ap2001
2001658,5021,867,60635.3%102141165,6766417053ap2002
2002733,9501,924,26438.1%100101106,6725616953ap2003
2003476,870790,32760.3%10041044,585517728ap2004
2004476,870790,32760.3%10041044,585517728ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 29 Jun 2013