Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebhat-Leab Worku, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Adigrat (Ethiopian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1918BornMonoxoito
3 Mar 194628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
12 Jun 197153.4AppointedBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
19 Sep 197153.7Ordained BishopBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
12 Oct 198466.7ResignedBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
27 Jan 199173.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Sebhat-Leab Worku:
Bishop Sebhat-Leab Worku S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Adigrat

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013