Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter J. Kairo

Archbishop of Nyeri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1941 BornLondiani
1 Nov 197029.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 198341.8AppointedBishop of Muranga, Kenya
21 May 198342.0Ordained BishopBishop of Muranga, Kenya
21 Apr 199755.9AppointedBishop of Nakuru, Kenya
19 Apr 200866.9AppointedArchbishop of Nyeri, Kenya
14 Jun 200867.1InstalledArchbishop of Nyeri, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Peter J. Kairo:
Archbishop Peter J. Kairo (born ) Archbishop of Nyeri

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nyeri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013