Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tombura-Yambio

Dioecesis Tomburaensis-Yambioensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 21 February 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Juba
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Sudan
  • Square Kilometers: 81,321 (31,410 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's Office Yambio, P.O. Box 27114, Kampala, Uganda
  • Telephone: (249)91-66-89-897

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Mupoi
3 March 1949ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
Prefecture Apostolic of Mupoi (erected)
3 July 1955Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
Prefecture Apostolic of Mupoi
Vicariate Apostolic of Rumbek (erected)
Diocese of Tombura
12 December 1974ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Mupoi Diocese of Tombura
Diocese of Tombura-Yambio
21 February 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Tombura Diocese of Tombura-Yambio

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Mupoi
195021,707257,0008.4%216181,20525174ap1951
196995,360150,00063.6%64109,5366133ap1971
Diocese of Tombura
1980134,826222,79460.5%741112,256799ap1981
Diocese of Tombura-Yambio
1990217,185477,53845.5%1071712,77593312ap1991
1999214,231454,34747.2%1341712,60192012ap2000
2000236,231464,34750.9%121219,68552112ap2001
2001241,000474,00050.8%131318,53852412ap2002
2003507,000522,00097.1%202025,35021212ap2004
2004310,000643,00048.2%2412512,40052913ap2005
2008995,0001,569,00063.4%3113231,09363112ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014