Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Prinetto

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Loreto

Titular Bishop of Hadriane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1906BornBussoleno
29 Jun 192922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Susa, Italy
18 Oct 196155.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Loreto, Italy
18 Oct 196155.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadriane
8 Dec 196155.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadriane
25 Apr 196558.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Loreto, Italy
29 May 199386.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Prinetto:
Bishop Angelo Prinetto (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Loreto

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015