Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge García Caballeros

Deceased

Bishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala

Apostolic Administrator of Sololá

Apostolic Administrator of San Marcos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1879Born
28 Mar 190323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
30 Jun 192849.1AppointedBishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
11 Nov 192849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
10 Mar 195171.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Marcos, Guatemala
10 Mar 195171.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sololá, Guatemala
5 Apr 195575.9DiedBishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Jorge García Caballeros
Bishop Jorge García Caballeros (born , died ) Bishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTotonicapán

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast