Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santiago Ricardo Vilanova y Meléndez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Ana

Titular Archbishop of Anchialus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1862BornSanta Tecla
7 Nov 188624.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Salvador, El Salvador
1 Aug 191351.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
1 Aug 191351.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mopsuestia
22 Mar 191451.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mopsuestia
15 Jan 191552.7AppointedBishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador
11 Aug 195290.3RetiredBishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador
11 Aug 195290.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anchialus
17 Jan 195390.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Ana, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Santiago Ricardo Vilanova y Meléndez:
Archbishop Santiago Ricardo Vilanova y Meléndez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Ana

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 57
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013