Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Garcia Urizar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1921BornQuetzaltenango
17 Dec 194928.1Ordained PriestPriest of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
4 Mar 198058.3AppointedBishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
26 Apr 198058.4Ordained BishopBishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
8 Jan 198765.1ResignedBishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
5 Sep 200684.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Oscar Garcia Urizar:
Bishop Oscar Garcia Urizar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013