Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Montenegro y Flores

Deceased

Bishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1869Born
11 Dec 189223.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 193566.0AppointedBishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
5 May 193566.3Ordained BishopBishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
24 May 194576.3DiedBishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for José Luis Montenegro y Flores
Bishop José Luis Montenegro y Flores (born , died ) Bishop of Verapaz, Cobán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast