Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Agustín Ganuza García, O.A.R.

Prelate Emeritus of Bocas del Toro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1931 BornArtajona, Spain
27 Jun 195422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
12 Mar 197038.5AppointedPrelate of Bocas del Toro, Panama
4 Feb 197240.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
27 May 197240.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pauzera
18 Nov 197746.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
1 May 200876.7RetiredPrelate of Bocas del Toro, Panama

MicroData Summary for José Agustín Ganuza García:
Bishop José Agustín Ganuza García O.A.R. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Bocas del Toro

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Bocas del Toro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 May 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013