Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anibal Saldaña Santamaría, O.A.R.

Prelate of Bocas del Toro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1958 BornPuerto Armuelles
198021.9ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
24 Oct 198224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
1 May 200850.3AppointedPrelate of Bocas del Toro, Panama
21 Jun 200850.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Bocas del Toro, Panama

MicroData Summary for Anibal Saldaña Santamaría:
Bishop Anibal Saldaña Santamaría O.A.R. (born ) Prelate of Bocas del Toro

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Bocas del Toro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013