Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Francesco Re

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1848BornButtigliera
3 Jun 187122.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188941.1AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
22 Jun 189041.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
24 Aug 189041.7InstalledBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
17 Jan 193384.1DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Francesco Re:
Bishop Giuseppe Francesco Re (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 86
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013