Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albino Morera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy

Titular Bishop of Gurza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1871Born
4 Apr 189624.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 192251.0AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
6 Jan 192351.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
9 Dec 195078.9RetiredBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
9 Dec 195078.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gurza
20 Mar 195280.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Albino Morera
Bishop Albino Morera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ampurias e Tempio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAiloche

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast