Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anthony Galante

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Camden, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1938Born
16 May 196425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
13 Oct 199254.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
13 Oct 199254.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Equilium
11 Dec 199254.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Equilium
5 Apr 199455.7AppointedBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
9 May 199455.8InstalledBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
23 Nov 199961.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
14 Jan 200061.5InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
23 Mar 200465.7AppointedBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
30 Apr 200465.8InstalledBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
8 Jan 201374.5ResignedBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
25 May 201980.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Camden, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anthony Galante (VIAF: 282300930)
Bishop Joseph Anthony Galante (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Camden

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSt. Mathieu, Church, San Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas
Death PlaceShore Medical Center, Somers Point, Diocese of Camden, New Jersey
Buried Place (Original)Saint Dominic Church, Cemetery, Torresdale, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,935
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2013
  • d: CB, 25 May 2019
  • 23.loc: CB, 27 May 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast