Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier DiLorenzo

Deceased

Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1942Born
18 May 196826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Jan 198845.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Jan 198845.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigias
8 Mar 198845.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigias
12 Oct 199351.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
29 Nov 199452.6AppointedBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
31 Mar 200461.9AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
24 May 200462.1InstalledBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
17 Aug 201775.3DiedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier DiLorenzo
Bishop Francis Xavier DiLorenzo (born , died ) Bishop of Richmond

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Cathedral, Scranton, Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceSt. Mary's Hospital, Richmond, Diocese of Richmond, Virginia

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,532
  • d: CB, 18 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Aug 2017