Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anthony Pepe

Bishop Emeritus of Las Vegas, Nevada, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1942 Born
16 May 197027.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
6 Apr 200158.8AppointedBishop of Las Vegas, Nevada, USA
31 May 200158.9Ordained BishopBishop of Las Vegas, Nevada, USA
28 Feb 201875.6RetiredBishop of Las Vegas, Nevada, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anthony Pepe (VIAF: 89279967)
Bishop Joseph Anthony Pepe (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Las Vegas

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopGuardian Angels, Cathedral, Las Vegas, Diocese of Las Vegas, Nevada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Las Vegas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,981
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast