Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Matthäus Karrer

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tunnuna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1968 Born
15 Jul 199526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
2 Mar 201748.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
2 Mar 201748.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
28 May 201748.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tunnuna

MicroData Summary for Matthäus Karrer
Father Matthäus Karrer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavensburg, Diocese of Rottenburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rottenburg, Diocese of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Rottenburg-Stuttgart.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 2 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Mar 2017