Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Wallis et Futuna

Dioecesis Uveanus et Futunensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 21 June 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nouméa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Wallis and Futuna
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 256 (98 Square Miles)
  • Description: (Former Latin Name: Vallisiensis et Futunensis, changed to current 25 Apr 1974)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche de Lano, B.P. 248, 98600 Mata'Utu, Iles Wallis et Futuna, Oceania
  • Telephone: 72.29.32
  • Fax: 72.27.83

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Wallis et Futuna
11 November 1935ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Wallis et Futuna (erected)
Diocese of Wallis et Futuna
21 June 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Wallis et Futuna Diocese of Wallis et Futuna

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Wallis et Futuna
19508,6358,64099.9%610165393535ap1951
Diocese of Wallis et Futuna
19708,5748,574100.0%9112042815535ap1971
198010,54910,80097.7%751287913505ap1981
199016,22916,37999.1%55101,62211385ap1991
199914,31614,34799.8%6391,5907335ap2000
200014,19214,39298.6%6391,57617445ap2001
200114,19214,50397.9%7291,57615345ap2002
200214,19215,00094.6%73101,41916405ap2003
200314,70015,00098.0%6281,83715305ap2004
200414,68714,98798.0%73101,4689335ap2005
201013,63114,23195.8%5381,70310355ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 22 Aug 2012