Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hervé-Maria Le Cléac’h, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1915BornDinéault, France
18 Dec 194328.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
1 Mar 197358.0AppointedBishop of Taiohae, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
24 Jun 197358.3Ordained BishopBishop of Taiohae, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
31 May 198671.2ResignedBishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
13 Aug 201297.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Hervé-Maria Le Cléac’h:
Bishop Hervé-Maria Le Cléac’h SS.CC. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Aug 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013