Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Christopher O’Riordan, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kenema, Sierra Leone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1924Born
29 Jun 195228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
4 Jun 198460.4AppointedBishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone
2 Dec 198460.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone
26 Apr 200278.3RetiredBishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone
22 Nov 201692.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Kenema, Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for John Christopher O’Riordan
Bishop John Christopher O’Riordan C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kenema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEffin, Ireland

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Nov 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 13 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast