Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Conti

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1871BornMassa di Cavriglia
22 Mar 191745.8AppointedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
3 Jun 191746.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
24 Apr 194169.9DiedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Conti:
Bishop Giuseppe Conti (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1917, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015