Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Bonardi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1863BornCastello di Signa
19 Jun 188622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
25 May 192864.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
25 May 192864.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
29 Jun 192864.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
17 Jan 194177.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Bonardi:
Bishop Gioacchino Bonardi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1928, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013