Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Torrini

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1878BornPomino
31 Mar 190122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fiesole, Italy
23 Dec 191840.3AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
19 Mar 191940.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
15 Jun 192849.8AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
11 Nov 192850.2InstalledArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
20 Jan 197394.4DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Torrini:
Archbishop Antonio Torrini (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

  • a priest for 71.8 years
  • a bishop for 53.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 42
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1919, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013