Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Paul-Antonin Fabre

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1837Born
14 Jun 186224.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 189255.1SelectedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
19 Jan 189355.2ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
25 Apr 189355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
26 Dec 191982.1DiedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Paul-Antonin Fabre (VIAF: 51728298)
Bishop Jacques-Paul-Antonin Fabre (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNîmes, Diocese of Nîmes, France
Ordained BishopSt. Sulpice, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017