Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Victor-Lucien-Sulpice Cardinal Lécot

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1831Born
24 Jun 185524.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 188655.1SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
10 Jun 188655.4ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
11 Jul 188655.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
3 Jun 189059.4SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
26 Jun 189059.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
12 Jun 189362.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 189463.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
19 Dec 190877.9DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for Victor-Lucien-Sulpice Lécot (VIAF: 27199824)
Victor-Lucien-Sulpice Cardinal Lécot (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontescourt-Lizerolles, Diocese of Soissons (-Laon)
Ordained PriestBeauvais, Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)
Ordained BishopSaint-Antoine, Compiègne
Death PlaceChambéry, Archdiocese of Chambéry
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
  • a cardinal for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 163, and Page 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1893
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017