Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Claude Neraz

Deceased

Bishop of San Antonio, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1828BornAnse, France
19 Mar 185325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston, Texas, USA
18 Feb 188153.1AppointedBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
8 May 188153.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
188759.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Brownsville, Texas, USA
25 Jul 189062.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Brownsville, Texas, USA
15 Nov 189466.8DiedBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Claude Neraz:
Bishop John Claude Neraz (born , died ) Bishop of San Antonio

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013