Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Anthony Forest

Deceased

Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1838Born
12 Apr 186324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston, Texas, USA
27 Aug 189556.6AppointedBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
28 Oct 189556.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
11 Mar 191172.2DiedBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Anthony Forest (VIAF: 23860179)
Bishop John Anthony Forest (born , died ) Bishop of San Antonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Martin la SauvetÚ, France
Ordained BishopS. Fernando, Cathedral, San Antonio, Diocese of San Antonio, Texas

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 111
  • opd/c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1895, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017